WebFind company research, competitor information, contact details & financial data for Alphonse Bock of Gouvy, LUXEMBOURG. Get the latest business insights from Dun & Bradstreet. D&B Business Directory HOME / BUSINESS ... Alphonse Lambert Jean Marie Bock. Director and Managing Director and Chairman of the Board. See All Contacts. Dynamic … WebGregor J. Bock (November 2, 1907 – October 17, 1991) was a member of the Wisconsin State Assembly.. Biography. Bock was born on November 2, 1907, in Muscoda, …
Jean Bock - frwiki.wiki
Bock's childhood was impacted by the loss of his mother at the end of World War II. He earned a teacher's diploma from the École normale de l’État de Verviers and conducted his military service from 1951 to 1952. He then taught at the École communale de Limerlé before leaving for the Belgian Congo from 1955 to 1960 in the Kasaï Province. There, he met his future wife, Andrée Léonard, with whom he had two children. WebJean Bock (Bovigny, 15 januari 1931 – Hoei, 11 september ... In 1999 werd Bock opnieuw verkozen in het Waals Parlement en nam deze keer het mandaat wel op. Hij bleef er zetelen ... Daarnaast was Bock van 1965 tot 2006 gemeenteraadslid en van 1983 tot 2004 burgemeester van Gouvy. In december 2006 verliet Bock de politiek. Externe ... myt to ct
Jean Bock - Wikiwand
WebJean Bock, né le 15 janvier 1931 à Bovigny et mort le 11 septembre 2024[1], est un homme politique belge francophone, membre du PRL, dont il fut vice-président à partir de 1974 et secrétaire politique adjoint depuis 1982. For faster navigation, this Iframe is preloading the Wikiwand page for Jean Bock. WebJean Bock a été à plusieurs reprises député permanent (l’équivalent du député provincial actuel). Il a également siégé au Sénat. Au niveau local, il a été bourgmestre de Gouvy … Web13 set 2024 · Ancien sénateur provincial durant dix années (1985-1995), Jean Bock était aussi connu dans notre province pour avoir endossé l’écharpe maïorale de Gouvy … myt to cet time